U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-po-00625-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Chisenhall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Multiple Citations)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • July 27, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • July 06, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.