U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-mj-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Hazen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Report /Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • July 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.