U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-mj-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Gravitt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 13, 2021: [Report /Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.