U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-po-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Scott
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Disposition of Count]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judge Assignment/Reassignment]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.