U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00690-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Morgan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 11, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • October 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 01, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed (Applicable Party Document)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Summons Issued (Sealed Pleading)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.