U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00684-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Close Case Administratively]
  • August 12, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.