U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00680-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Failure to Attend]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed Pleading)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.