U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00669-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Close Case Administratively]
  • September 13, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Receipt of Funds]
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed Pleading)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.