U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00667-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Fernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • November 07, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information (Single Citation)]
  • November 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • November 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 03, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.