U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00654-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Caviness
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 23, 2022: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • October 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Minute Entry]
  • November 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • September 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed Pleading)]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.