U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-po-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Rodrigue
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • December 12, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Update CVB Disposition Information]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Set Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Citation Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.