U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-mj-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Bartlett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Report /Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2021: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.