U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Verdin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [In Chambers Conference ]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 06, 2021: [In Chambers Conference ]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.