U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-po-00731-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Hazelton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Close Case Administratively]
January, 2022
  • January 08, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Failure to Attend]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • November 18, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.