U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-po-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
  • March 25, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Disposition of Count]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Citation Issued]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.