U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00769-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Hibbert
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • September 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.