U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00741-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Browder
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.