U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santiago-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Pretrial Bail Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.