U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-po-00835-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Davison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 05, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Close Case Administratively]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • September 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • August 31, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.