U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00935-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Mountain
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bench Trial - Begun]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.