U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00870-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 18, 2022: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • March 17, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order (Lake Charles)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enroll Counsel]
  • September 22, 2021: [Enroll Counsel]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.