U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-po-00868-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Corder
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed Pleading)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.