U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-po-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Hatchett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Multiple Citations)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB if PE/TE disp)]
July, 2022
  • July 16, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.