U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-po-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Ventura
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Final Payment Received]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Update CVB Disposition Information]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment Received]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Citation Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.