U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00142-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ignont et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 27, 2022: [Witness List (Sealed Pleading)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Minute Entry]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 14, 2022: [Waiver (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Unseal Complaint]
  • December 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.