U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mc-00474
  • Case Name: In re: DMCA 512(h) Subpoena to X Corp.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Submitted for Issuance]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.