U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00309
  • Case Name: Williams v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • March 25, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.