U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00384
  • Case Name: Johnson v. E P Expedited Transport L L C et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motions Transferred]
  • May 12, 2025: [Corrective Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 09, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 17, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 07, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.