U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-00314
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Enterprise Products Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Appeal Record Certified to USCA]
  • May 08, 2025: [Costs Taxed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response in Support (NOT Motions)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition (NOT Motions)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum Ruling]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.