U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Melecio v. ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 23, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 16, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.