U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00585
  • Case Name: Audubon Street Holdings, LLC et al v. Berg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • April 09, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 08, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.