U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Eskridge v. Cardenas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.