U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Nixon v. Berkley National Insurance Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case (30, 60, 90 day)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.