U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mc-00588
  • Case Name: Tullier, et al v. Ace American Insurance Company, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • March 28, 2025: [Quash]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Misc Case Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.