U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-06169
  • Case Name: Cambridge Rental Properties LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.