U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Brennan v. Pizza Hut Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [District Transfer/Remand Record Received]
  • May 13, 2025: [District Transfer Out (Form Included Only If Manual Attachment Exists)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transfer Case]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.