U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02947
  • Case Name: Kittrell v. ENSCO Offshore, LLC, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 24, 2025: [Substitute Party]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Submitted for Issuance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.