U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00612
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • May 14, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • May 09, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 08, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • March 31, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.