U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02748
  • Case Name: Santano v. Tulane University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 28, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.