U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00736
  • Case Name: Finnegan's Investments, LLC v. Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 24, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 22, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • April 11, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Witness and Exhibit List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.