U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-04590
  • Case Name: Wong et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • April 14, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 14, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exhibit List]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.