U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00615
  • Case Name: LeBlanc v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 15, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 07, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 28, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request for Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.