U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01312
  • Case Name: Meullion et al v. Board of Supervisors University of Louisiana System
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Minute Entry/Order Setting Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motions Transferred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 21, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 21, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Minute Entry]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.