U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02458
  • Case Name: Viner v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.