U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Williams v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (First)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.