U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01685
  • Case Name: Lau v. Thrifty Discount Liquor & Wines et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Motions Transferred]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.