U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02746
  • Case Name: Britt et al v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Amendment/Supplement to Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 23, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.