U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Jalbert v. Raymond James & Associates Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Pretrial Stipulation/Statement/Memorandum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition (NOT Motions)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Minute Entry]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corrective Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Corrective Action]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • March 31, 2025: [Daubert Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.