U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01679
  • Case Name: Lawrence v. Louisiana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motions Transferred]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.