U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00454
  • Case Name: Equity Capital Markets, LLC v. Safeport Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply in Support of Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appoint Expert]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (First)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Enroll as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.